Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Bonifaz von Haneberg, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1816Born
29 Aug 183923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
1851¹34.5ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 May 187255.9SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
29 Jul 187256.1ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
25 Aug 187256.1Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
31 May 187659.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Bonifaz von Haneberg (VIAF: 47137755)
Bishop Daniel Bonifaz von Haneberg O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLenzfried, Diocese of Augsburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, München, Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 526
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Mar 2017