Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walther von Dillingen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Sep 1133AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
9 Sep 1134Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1152²ResignedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1153¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walther von Dillingen (VIAF: 15964983)
Bishop Walther von Dillingen (died 1153) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSeligenstadt

  • a bishop for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: ATh, 13 Feb 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast