Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Kasimir Röls

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Amyclae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1646³BornSchwandorf
5 Apr 167024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
12 Mar 170862.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
12 Mar 170862.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
20 May 170862.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
8 Feb 171568.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Kasimir Röls:
Bishop Johann Kasimir Röls (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Augsburg

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015