Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JÚrome Meitinger

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496Born
9 Dec 153640.9AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
17 Dec 153640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
17 Feb 155862.1DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for JÚrome Meitinger (VIAF: 89965171)
Bishop JÚrome Meitinger (born 1496, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugsburg

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1536, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018