Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anslem von Nenningen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹BornBenningen
23 Aug 141363.6SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
24 Sep 141464.7ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
6 Dec 141969.9Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
11 Nov 142373.8ResignedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
10 Jan 142878.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anslem von Nenningen: VIAF:80841836
Bishop Anslem von Nenningen (born 1350, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

  • a bishop for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 25 Jan 2016