Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Lichtenauer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1562AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
9 Jan 1562AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
28 Jun 1562Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
11 Dec 1570DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Lichtenauer:
Bishop Friedrich Lichtenauer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 254
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013