Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bonifatius (Magnus) Fleschutz, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1861Born
3 May 188625.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 188726.8AppointedPrefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania
20 Nov 188726.8ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jan 189130.0DiedPrefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Bonifatius (Magnus) Fleschutz
Father Bonifatius (Magnus) Fleschutz O.S.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Southern Zanguebar {Zanguebar Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReicholzried, Germany

  • a priest for 4.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017