Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Werdenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431Born
5 Apr 146635.2Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
15 May 146938.3AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Jul 146938.5Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
23 Feb 148655.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Werdenberg
Bishop Johann von Werdenberg (born 1431, died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrochtelfingen

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,502
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1469, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast