Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Soden-Fraunhofen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Titular Bishop of Belali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1920BornFriedrichshafen
29 Jun 195130.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 197251.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
3 Jan 197251.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
18 Mar 197251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
13 Jul 199372.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
23 Jul 200079.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Soden-Fraunhofen:
Bishop Heinrich von Soden-Fraunhofen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013