Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Rackl

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1883Born
29 Jun 190925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
4 Nov 193552.0AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
21 Dec 193552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
5 May 194864.5DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Michael Rackl (VIAF: 3263384)
Bishop Michael Rackl (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRittersdorf

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018