Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo (Johannes) von Mergel, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1847Born
29 Mar 187325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
1882²34.0EnteredPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Dec 188335.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
5 Oct 190557.8SelectedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
11 Dec 190558.0ConfirmedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
27 Dec 190558.0Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
20 Jun 193284.5DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leo (Johannes) von Mergel (VIAF: 69710998)
Bishop Leo (Johannes) von Mergel O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRohrbach
Death PlaceEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1905, Number 57
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast