Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Marschalk zu Pappenheim

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1492¹Born
28 Jan 153543.0AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Apr 153644.3Ordained BishopBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
19 Jun 153947.4DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Marschalk zu Pappenheim (VIAF: 103355553)
Bishop Christoph Marschalk zu Pappenheim (born 1492, died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlacePappenheim

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018