Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Holl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
1559Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Aug 1570AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
23 Aug 1570AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
5 Nov 1570Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
4 Sep 1590DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Holl
Bishop Wolfgang Holl (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwäbisch Hall
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 273
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 17, Number 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast