Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Ertlin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
156823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
10 May 158136.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
10 May 158136.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
30 Nov 158136.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
26 Mar 160762.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Ertlin (VIAF: 77113641)
Bishop Johann Ertlin (born 1545, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonheim
Ordained BishopHofkapelle, Bamberg, Diocese of Bamberg

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,826
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018