Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christian Würtz

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Germania in Dacia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1971 Born
14 May 200634.9Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
26 Apr 201947.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
26 Apr 201947.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia
30 Jun 201948.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia

MicroData Summary for Christian Würtz
Father Christian Würtz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarlsruhe
Ordained BishopMünster Unserer Lieben Frau, Cathedral, Freiburg im Breisgau, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 27 Apr 2019

Quantcast