Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Gottfried Groß von Trockau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Rosalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1687Born
7 Mar 171629.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
11 Apr 171629.1Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
8 Mar 174558.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
8 Mar 174558.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
20 Apr 174558.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
15 Sep 175063.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Gottfried Groß von Trockau
Bishop Johann Gottfried Groß von Trockau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeldenstein Neuhaus

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,619
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017