Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Georg von Ehrler

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1833BornMiltenberg
2 May 185522.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
10 Aug 185623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
9 Jun 187845.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
15 Jul 187845.3ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
6 Oct 187845.5Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
18 Mar 190571.9DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Georg von Ehrler:
Bishop Joseph Georg von Ehrler (born , died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013