Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Kazimierz Kluz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland

Titular Bishop of Hilta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1925Born
24 Jun 195126.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 197247.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
12 May 197247.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
12 Jun 197247.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta
5 Dec 198257.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Kazimierz Kluz
Bishop Józef Kazimierz Kluz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlpiny
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Assumption of the Blessed Virgin Mary, Cathedral, Gdańsk, Diocese of Gdańsk

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,824
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast