Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Franco, C.P.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1771Born
13 Mar 180230.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Pious Workers
24 Jan 182957.7SelectedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
18 May 182958.0ConfirmedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
24 May 182958.0Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
27 Aug 185180.3DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Franco
Bishop Matteo Franco C.P.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalerno

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,829, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast