Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Gentilini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1782BornSpoleto
5 Jun 180522.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 183249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
23 Sep 183249.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
15 Apr 183350.5AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 Dec 184462.2ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
20 Jan 184562.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
12 May 185673.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gentilini:
Archbishop Francesco Gentilini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 72, and Page 89
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013