Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donat Nicholas Vincenzo Zaccaria Boccardo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1760Born
20 Dec 178323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jan 182968.1SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
18 May 182968.4ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
26 May 182968.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
7 Apr 183372.3DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Donat Nicholas Vincenzo Zaccaria Boccardo (VIAF: 304912329)
Bishop Donat Nicholas Vincenzo Zaccaria Boccardo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSicignano

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1829, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018