Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Patrick Donahue

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Emmaüs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1870Born
8 Jun 189524.5Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
27 Jan 194574.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
27 Jan 194574.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
19 Mar 194574.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
26 Apr 195988.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Patrick Donahue
Bishop Joseph Patrick Donahue (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1945, Number 12
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast