Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Michele Joseph Graziano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1921BornMount Vernon, NY, USA
26 Jan 194725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Aug 196140.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Ana, El Salvador
11 Aug 196140.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
21 Sep 196140.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
24 Aug 196544.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
10 Jan 196846.8SucceededBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
27 Jun 196948.2ResignedBishop of San Miguel, El Salvador
27 Jun 196948.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Valabria
12 Feb 197654.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Valabria
16 May 199069.1DiedBishop Emeritus of San Miguel, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Michele Joseph Graziano:
Bishop Lorenzo Michele Joseph Graziano O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Miguel

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013