Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Arturo Brown, M.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

Titular Bishop of Vallis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1919BornNew York, NY, USA
9 Jun 194626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
29 Nov 195637.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
29 Nov 195637.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
27 Feb 195737.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vallis
14 May 199777.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Arturo Brown:
Bishop Carlos Arturo Brown M.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013