Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edgar McCafferty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Tanudaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1920Born
17 Mar 194525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
5 Jan 196847.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA
5 Jan 196847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
14 Jun 196848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanudaia
30 Apr 198060.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Edgar McCafferty
Bishop John Edgar McCafferty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018