Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Tkotsch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

Titular Bishop of Eleutherna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1895BornGogolin
17 Mar 192327.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
13 Aug 193035.1IncardinatedPriest of Berlin, Germany
12 May 194852.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
12 May 194852.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
11 Jun 194853.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
14 May 196367.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Tkotsch:
Bishop Paul Tkotsch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Berlin

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013