Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heinrich Wienken

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meißen (Meissen)

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1883BornCloppenburg
6 Jun 190926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
22 Feb 193754.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
22 Feb 193754.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
11 Apr 193754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
9 Mar 195168.1SucceededBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
29 Nov 195168.8InstalledBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
19 Aug 195774.5RetiredBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
19 Aug 195774.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
21 Jan 196177.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Wienken:
Archbishop Heinrich Wienken (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meißen (Meissen)

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013