Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Felipe de Azúa e Iturgoyen

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1693BornSantigao
1722¹28.5Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
27 Jul 173542.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Concepción, Chile
27 Jul 173542.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
17 Apr 174046.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
27 Dec 174148.5SelectedBishop of Concepción, Chile
28 Feb 174248.7ConfirmedBishop of Concepción, Chile
3 Nov 174451.4SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
18 Dec 174451.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
20 Jan 174854.6InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
11 Aug 175360.2ResignedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
22 Apr 175460.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Felipe de Azúa e Iturgoyen:
Archbishop Pedro Felipe de Azúa e Iturgoyen (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216, and Page 451
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015