Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginaldo de Lizárraga, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paraguay

Note/Previous Titular See: (Baltasar de Ovando)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1535²Born
1560²25.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Aug 159863.6ConfirmedBishop of Concepción, Chile
24 Oct 159964.8Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
2 Dec 160267.9InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
20 Jul 160974.5AppointedBishop of Paraguay
10 Nov 160974.8DiedBishop of Paraguay

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reginaldo de Lizárraga
Bishop Reginaldo de Lizárraga O.P. (born 1535, died ) Bishop of Paraguay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLizárraga, Spain

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 98, and Page 158
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 113, Number 717
  • i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017