Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Eufrasio de Quiroga Sarmiento

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1776¹BornSan Juan de Cuyo
1801¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 183761.4AppointedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
29 Mar 184064.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
25 Jan 185276.1DiedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Eufrasio de Quiroga Sarmiento:
Bishop José Manuel Eufrasio de Quiroga Sarmiento (died ) Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,842
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013