Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Gelabert y Crespo

Deceased

Bishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1820Born
17 Oct 184222.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 186545.0AppointedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
21 Sep 186545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Paraná, Argentina
1 Oct 186545.5InstalledBishop of Paraná, Argentina
23 Nov 189777.6DiedBishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Gelabert y Crespo
Bishop José María Gelabert y Crespo (born , died ) Bishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fe
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Diocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 440
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018