Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Vera y Durán

Deceased

Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1813Born
5 Jun 184128.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 185946.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Montevideo, Uruguay
22 Sep 186451.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara
16 Jul 186552.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megara
15 Jul 187865.1AppointedBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
6 May 188167.9DiedBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Vera y Durán (VIAF: 11193764)
Bishop Jacinto Vera y Durán (born , died ) Bishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Caterina, Diocese of Săo Sebastiăo do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil, Italy
Ordained BishopMontevideo, Vicariate Apostolic of Montevideo

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 376, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017