Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Posadas

Dioecesis Posadensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Corrientes
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 6,426 (2,482 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.obposadas.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Felix de Azara 1604, N3300LQJ Posadas [Misiones], Argentina
  • Telephone: (0376)4423.221

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1957ErectedDiocese of Corrientes (Misiones) Diocese of Posadas (erected)
10 April 1961Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Posadas (from Paraná)
16 June 1986Territory LostDiocese of Posadas (Eldorado, General Manuel Belgrado, Iguazú, Montecarlo, San Pedro, and Guaraní (except San Vicente and part of El Soberbio)) Diocese of Puerto Iguazú (erected)
13 June 2009Territory LostDiocese of Posadas (San Antonio de Padua, Cristo Rey, Santa Rita, San José Obrero, and Ascension del Señor (in Oberá); San Rafael Arcángel, Santa Teresita del Niño Jesús, and María de Itatí (in Cainguás); Santa Teresita del Nino Jesus, Santa Catalina de Siena, and Santa ...)
Diocese of Puerto Iguazú (Cristo Rey, San Juan Neumann, and San Vicente de Paúl along with Asunción de la Santísima Virgen (Ukrainian, in Guaraní))
Diocese of Oberá (erected)
13 June 2009Territory LostDiocese of Posadas (San Alberto Magno (in Puerto Rico) and San Luis Gonzaga (in Capioví)) Diocese of Puerto Iguazú

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966303,385391,09477.6%1076863,5272115048ap1967
1970430,000.0%1293105010019214ap1971
1976424,442487,86587.0%14921064,00410220757ap1977
1980468,000537,00087.2%12951074,37310618762ap1981
1990398,580493,07680.8%1861795,04576717140ap1991
1999550,000680,00080.9%2561866,395196416536ap2000
2000550,000680,00080.9%2566916,043296816536ap2001
2001570,000700,00081.4%2367906,333297015236ap2002
2002550,000680,40080.8%2561866,395286415536ap2003
2003551,000681,50080.9%2763906,122276515036ap2004
2004552,890769,00071.9%3258906,143266016537ap2005
2013498,000622,00080.1%3737746,72921409333ap2014
2016469,534624,00075.2%3826647,33633307534ap2017
2019475,300780,00060.9%3735726,60133417434ap2020
2021478,242787,53060.7%3833716,73537395535ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 653, to Page 662
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 75, to Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 15 Aug 2023