Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Buxarrais Ventura

Bishop Emeritus of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1929 Born
17 Dec 195526.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 197141.6AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
3 Oct 197141.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
13 Apr 197343.3AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
11 Sep 199161.7ResignedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Buxarrais Ventura
Bishop Ramón Buxarrais Ventura (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Perpetua de Moguda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Málaga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018