Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Anthony Marconi

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark, New Jersey

Titular Bishop of Bure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1927 BornNewark
30 May 195326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 May 197649.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
3 May 197649.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bure
25 Jun 197649.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bure
1 Jul 200275.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Dominic Anthony Marconi:
Bishop Dominic Anthony Marconi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Newark

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013