Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (Joćo) Zerbini, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1927 BornChiari, Italy
29 Jun 195628.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Jan 199567.0AppointedBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
19 Feb 199567.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
2 Jul 200375.5RetiredBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Joćo) Zerbini:
Bishop Giovanni (Joćo) Zerbini S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarapuava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,534

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Jun 2014