Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião de Morais, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Funay (Funai), Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1536²Born
1550²14.0EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
1560²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1569²33.0ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Feb 158852.1AppointedBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
27 Mar 158852.2Ordained BishopBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan
19 Aug 158852.6DiedBishop of Funay (Funai), Japan

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião de Morais (VIAF: 306478838)
Bishop Sebastião de Morais S.J. (born 1536, died ) Bishop of Funay (Funai)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFunchal, Archdiocese of Funchal, Portugal
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Death PlaceMozambique

  • a priest for 28.6 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,047
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018