Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António José Cavaco Carrilho

Bishop Emeritus of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1942 Born
28 Jul 196523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
22 Feb 199956.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
22 Feb 199956.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
29 May 199957.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamalluma
8 Mar 200764.9AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
12 Jan 201976.7RetiredBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António José Cavaco Carrilho
Bishop António José Cavaco Carrilho (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoulé
Ordained BishopSão Pedro do Mar, Church, Quarteira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Funchal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,563
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Jan 2019

Quantcast