Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco José Rodrigues de Andrade

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1763³Born
25 Jul 178724.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 182158.3SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
24 Sep 182158.5ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
2 May 183875.1DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco José Rodrigues de Andrade
Bishop Francisco José Rodrigues de Andrade (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa

  • a priest for 50.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018