Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antunes Santana

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1924Born
29 Jun 194823.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 197449.4AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
21 Apr 197449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
5 Mar 198257.4DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antunes Santana
Bishop Francisco Antunes Santana (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast