Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourenço de Távora, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elvas


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1587ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
24 Oct 1609SelectedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
27 Jan 1610ConfirmedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
6 Jun 1610Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
18 Sep 1617AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
1625²ResignedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
11 May 1629DiedBishop Emeritus of Elvas, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lourenço de Távora:
Bishop Lourenço de Távora O.F.M. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elvas

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,725
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 191, and Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015