Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro de Risio, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Severina

Titular Archbishop of Stauropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1823BornScerni
20 Dec 184522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 May 184723.7ProfessedDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
18 Dec 184724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 May 187248.6AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
9 May 187248.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Nov 189673.2ResignedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
30 Nov 189673.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Stauropolis
20 Apr 190177.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro de Risio:
Archbishop Alessandro de Risio C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Severina

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 515, and Page 528
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013