Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tobia Masacci

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1803Born
23 Sep 182622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cesena, Italy
23 Feb 187268.2AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
3 Mar 187268.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
17 Jan 188076.1DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tobia Masacci
Bishop Tobia Masacci (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena, Diocese of Cesena
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 502
  • ob: AT, 2 Dec 2016
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,197
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018