Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Moreschi

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1816Born
25 May 183923.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187155.5AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
24 Nov 187155.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
17 Dec 187155.5Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
1872²55.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
9 Nov 188771.4DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Moreschi
Bishop Giuseppe Moreschi (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria Nuova, Diocese of Jesi
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Magdalena, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,332
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164, and Page 207
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1871, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018