Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Rocca

Deceased

Bishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1817Born
19 Sep 184023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
25 Jul 187356.1AppointedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
27 Jul 187356.1Ordained BishopBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy
26 Jan 188668.6DiedBishop of Reggio Emilia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guido Rocca
Bishop Guido Rocca (born , died ) Bishop of Reggio Emilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopSt Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017