Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Guadalupi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1811Born
23 Sep 183726.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 187260.6AppointedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
9 May 187260.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
8 Mar 187765.4ResignedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
11 May 187866.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Guadalupi
Archbishop Domenico Guadalupi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salerno (-Acerno)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrindisi, Archdiocese of Brindisi
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017