Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Imre Lósy

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
1622²42.0SelectedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
22 Apr 163050.3AppointedBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
22 Jun 163151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Varaždin, Croatia
1634¹54.0AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
16 Nov 163757.8AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
9 Feb 164262.1DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Imre Lósy
Archbishop Imre Lósy (born 1580, died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLosy

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 323, and Page 359
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 377, and Page 380
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018