Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop János Vitéz (Zredna)

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1408¹BornZrednán
4 Jun 144537.4AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
11 May 146557.4AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
11 Aug 147264.6DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for János Vitéz (Zredna):
Archbishop János Vitéz (Zredna) (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 262, and Page 242
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Nov 1468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013