Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György Szatmári

Deceased

Archbishop of Esztergom


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Apr 1500AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
14 Feb 1502AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
19 Dec 1505AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
18 May 1523AppointedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary
7 Apr 1524DiedArchbishop of Esztergom, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Szatmári:
Archbishop György Szatmári (died ) Archbishop of Esztergom

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 262, and Page 266
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 280, and Page 326
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 4 Jan 2015