Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Kondé de Póka-Telek

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1732Born
21 Dec 175422.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 175523.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 179159.4SelectedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Sep 179260.1ConfirmedBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
9 Dec 179260.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
16 Aug 180068.0SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
22 Dec 180068.4ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
18 Dec 180270.4DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Kondé de Póka-Telek
Bishop Nikolaus Kondé de Póka-Telek (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzerdahely

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 119
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 389
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast